Ross, Stephen George (CPSO#: 31882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
250 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1B2
Phone: (416) 789-5012
Fax: (416) 789-5072
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tottenham Medical Centre
119 Queen Street North
Tottenham ON  L0G 1W0
Canada
Phone: (905) 936-4211
Fax: (905) 936-3493
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen G. Ross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ross ( CPSO# 31882 )

Business Address:
Sutie 210
250 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 789-5012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN GEORGE ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 07 Dec 2004
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 07 Dec 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 17 Dec 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2006

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Oct 2004
Summary:

On October 18, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Ross to have committed acts of 
professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful or unprofessional. 
 
On December 7, 2004, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed the following: 
 
      1. Dr. Ross appear before the Committee to be reprimanded and the reprimand be 
         recorded in the Register. 
      2. The Registrar suspend Dr. Ross s licence for six (6) months commencing the date 
         of this order.  The suspension will itself be suspended provided that Dr. Ross 
         complies with the following conditions and requirements, which shall be terms, 
         conditions and limitations on his certificate of registration. 
      3. Dr. Ross receive treatment by a Psychiatrist of his choosing acceptable to the 
         College, until the later of (a) the date on which the treating psychiatrist is satisfied 
         that the treatment has been successful, and (b) the date which is two years from 
         the date of this order.  The treating Psychiatrist shall undertake to provide reports 
         every six (6) months to the Registrar reporting on the progress of treatment of the 
         conditions that influence Dr. Ross s ability to practice medicine, with the first 
         report due six months from the date of this Order.  Dr. Ross shall be responsible 
         for any financial obligations relating to the treatment and reporting. 
      4. Dr. Ross submit to the College the name of a physician acceptable to the College 
         who act as his practice supervisor and will report every three months to the 
         College as to the appropriateness of his behaviour and interaction with patients 
         and staff at his practice location, as well as the appropriateness of his workload.  
         This supervised practice and reporting shall continue for at least one year.  
         Following that year, Dr. Ross shall continue in supervised practice until his 
         treating Psychiatrist is of the opinion that Dr. Ross has a low risk of re-offending 
         and has reported that opinion to the College. Dr. Ross shall be responsible for any 
         costs relating to his practice supervision and reporting. 
      5. For the period of one year, Dr. Ross may only attend female patients in the 
         presence of a registered health professional who is acceptable to the College and 
         will report on the appropriateness of Dr. Ross s behaviour to his practice 
         supervisor. 
      6. Dr. Ross may not practice at the hospital he practised at for a period of one year 
         from the date of this order, and only after conditions in paragraph 4 above are 
         satisfied. 
      7. Dr. Ross shall deliver to the College certificates of completion of the courses 
         taken in Boundaries and Communication during the past two years. 
    

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 07, 2004