Rosser, Walter Wylie (CPSO#: 21558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medicine Centre
Queen's University
P O Bag 888
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9303
Fax: (613) 544-9899
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walter Rosser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1970 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER WYLIE ROSSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSSER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1968