Rossos, Peter George (CPSO#: 56868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite 9N-975
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5333
Fax: (416) 340-5335
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter G. Rossos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rossos ( CPSO# 56868 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
9N-975
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GEORGE ROSSOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSSOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Apr 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1988