Roth, Lisa Rosanne (CPSO#: 73570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone: (519) 396-6767
Fax: (866) 685-0058
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Roth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2007


Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Roth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Roth ( CPSO# 73570 )

Business Address:
550 Philip Place
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3A6
Phone Number: (519) 396-4400

Business Address:
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone Number: (519) 396-6767

Business Address:
1199 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G6
Phone Number: (519) 396-3331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ROSANNE ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2001