Rouphael, Rita Elias (CPSO#: 86838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Lebanese University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone: (613) 258-8710
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rita E. Rouphael Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rouphael ( CPSO# 86838 )

Business Address:
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone Number: (613) 258-8710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RITA ELIAS ROUPHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUPHAEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 15 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 16 Sep 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2015