Rouzati, Amir (CPSO#: 79892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1298
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medprime Medical Centre
Unit 34C
100 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y1
Canada
Phone: (905) 762-9996
Fax: (905) 762-0038
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amir Rouzati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 18 2008


Corporation Name: Dr. Amir Rouzati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rouzati ( CPSO# 79892 )

Business Address:
Medprime Medical Centre
Unit 34C
100 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y1
Phone Number: (905) 762-9996

Business Address:
206 - 2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone Number: (905) 907-5055

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIR ROUZATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUZATI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2005