Rowe Mahon, Patricia Elaine (CPSO#: 57436)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HPHA - Stratford Site
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford, Ontario
N5A 2Y6
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Ext. 2872
Fax: (519) 272-8198
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahon-Rowe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rowe Mahon ( CPSO# 57436 )
Dr. J. Mahon ( CPSO# 57609 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Endocrinology and Metabolism
268 Grosvenor Street, Room B5-109
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6335

Business Address:
HPHA - Stratford Site
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador
Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ELAINE ROWE MAHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWE MAHON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1991