Rowlands, Donna Rae (CPSO#: 64857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Mar 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
72 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 5Z8
Phone: (519) 770-0128
Fax: (519) 770-0132
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: 519-751-5544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donna Rowlands Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rowlands ( CPSO# 64857 )

Business Address:
72 Brant Avenue
2nd Floor
Brantford ON  N3T 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 770-0128

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA RAE ROWLANDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWLANDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Mar 1992 to 13 Apr 1992
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Apr 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1998