Roy, Paul Damien (CPSO#: 64298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 722-3222
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 945-1111
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Roy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Roy ( CPSO# 64298 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone Number: (613) 722-3222

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone Number: (613) 945-1060

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL DAMIEN ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991