Roye, Charmaine Antoinette (CPSO#: 61763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone: (519) 753-8666
Fax: (519) 753-3109
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Downie, Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Thompson ( CPSO# 54979 )
Dr. C. Roye ( CPSO# 61763 )
Dr. D. Lowcock ( CPSO# 30284 )
Dr. D. Downie ( CPSO# 64176 )
Dr. K. Bates ( CPSO# 50121 )
Dr. C. Cowan ( CPSO# 60712 )

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666


Corporation Name: Dr. Charmaine Roye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Roye ( CPSO# 61763 )

Business Address:
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J3
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Business Address:
969 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARMAINE ANTOINETTE ROYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROYE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989