Ruban, Thanu (CPSO#: 88532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Names: Nadarajah, Thanu (used until: 11 Sep 2014 )     Nadarajah, Thanusiah (used until: 22 Jun 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boxgrove Medical Arts Centre
110 Copper Creek Drive
Suite 304
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: 905-554-3755
Fax: 905-554-3752
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thanu Ruban Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ruban ( CPSO# 88532 )

Business Address:
Boxgrove Medical Arts Centre
110 Copper Creek Drive
Unit 304
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 554-3755

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 29 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THANU RUBAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 03 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 04 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013