Rubenchik, Illana Aviva (CPSO#: 63544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Sep 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratories
North York General Hospital
North York Division
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6254
Fax: (416) 756-4294
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Illana Rubenchik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rubenchik ( CPSO# 63544 )

Business Address:
Department of Laboratory Medicine
North York General Hospital
North York Division
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6254

Business Address:
Lifelabs Medical Laboratory Services
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 May 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Illana  Aviva  Rubenchik  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  anatomical pathology, only.