Rubenis, Andrew Arvids (CPSO#: 23909)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 27 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Arvids Rubenis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 24 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact the following long term care/nursing homes: Extendicare Rouge Valley: 551 Conlins Road, Scarborough ON M1B 5S1; Extendicare Scarborough: 3830 Lawrence Avenue East, Scarborough ON M1S 1R8; Leisureworld Altamont: 92 Island Road, West Hill ON M1C 2P5; Tony Stacey Centre for Veterans' Care: 59 Lawson Road, Scarborough ON M1C 2J1; Chartwell Guildwood: 65 Livingston Road, Scarborough ON M1E 1L1.
Date Received: 27 Mar 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Mar 2015