Rubenstein, Elizabeth Jane (CPSO#: 74778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Lawrence College
100 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K6V 5X3
Phone: (613) 544-5400
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Street Health Centre
115 Barrack street
Kingston ON  K7K 0B5
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-1440
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH JANE RUBENSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBENSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2003