Ruddock, William Donald Jeffrey (CPSO#: 79303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-1871
Fax: (519) 822-1990
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. A.J. Northey and W.D.J. Ruddock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Northey ( CPSO# 77644 )
Dr. W. Ruddock ( CPSO# 79303 )

Business Address:
302 - 85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-1871

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM DONALD JEFFREY RUDDOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDDOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005