Rudinskas, Leona Constance (CPSO#: 54710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Jan 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Lithuanian

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
27 John Street
Weston ON  M9N 1J4
Phone: 416-248-6060
Fax: 416-248-5922
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leona Rudinskas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rudinskas ( CPSO# 54710 )

Business Address:
27 John Street
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M9N 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 248-6060

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 09 Dec 2013
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2014
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 14 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 09 Dec 2013 Active View Details [+]
            On December 9, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Leona Constance
            Rudinskas committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she failed to
            maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. Rudinskas admitted the
            allegation. She practises oncology, haematology and internal medicine in
            Toronto, Ontario.  

            Patient A
            Dr. Rudinskas failed to: perform appropriate assessments; round at an
            appropriate hour; review patient's condition as documented in her chart and in
            test results in a timely manner, and to respond in a timely manner to
            information about her condition; appropriately assess her following a
            haemoglobin drop; order a CT scan on a 'stat' basis; review results of
            abdominal x-rays demonstrating the existence of a bowel obstruction in a timely
            manner; diagnose a bowel obstruction in a timely manner; and communicate in a
            timely manner with the patient's family.

            Patient B
            Patient B, an infant, died of known cardiac congenital abnormalities. In her
            role as Coroner, Dr. Rudinskas attended at the hospital and communicated in an
            insensitive and unprofessional manner with the patient's parents immediately
            after his death in the course of communicating to them about the policy of the
            Coroner's office regarding co-sleeping.

            Patient C
            Dr. Rudinskas failed to: conduct her first patient encounter with Patient C at
            an appropriate hour; conduct a physical examination during her time as his most
            responsible physician; communicate in a timely and professional manner with the
            patient and his family, including by failing to adequately discuss her plan of
            care with him; terminate the physician-patient relationship in accordance with
            College policy; and accurately document her reason for termination. In
            terminating the relationship, Dr. Rudinskas communicated with the patient's
            daughter in an insensitive and unprofessional manner.

            Patient D
            Dr. Rudinskas communicated additional information confirming the patient's
            cancer diagnosis to her in an inappropriate manner and at an inappropriate hour
            and failed to document an appropriate discussion of the risks and benefits of
            treatment.

            Patient E
            Dr. Rudinskas failed to document in patient's chart the rationale for a
            treatment decision, an appropriate discussion regarding the same, and an
            appropriate discussion regarding the use of a taxane regime. She also failed to
            make a physician-to-physician transfer when the patient moved to another city
            to complete her treatment.

            Patient F and G
            Dr. Rudinskas failed to document in the patients' charts an appropriate
            discussion of the risks and benefits of treatment.

            Patient H
            Dr. Rudinskas failed to consider additional steps to investigate a differential
            diagnosis for this patient's anemia.

            Patient I and Patient M
            Dr. Rudinskas failed to document in the patients' charts appropriate physical
            examination and appropriate discussion regarding the risks of benefits of
            treatment.

            Patient J
            Dr. Rudinskas failed to document appropriate assessment of Patient J when she
            presented complaining of gait instability and failed to document the treatment
            plan in the patient's chart.

            Patient K
            Dr. Rudinskas failed to document in the patient's chart the reasons for her
            decision to administer a seventh round of chemotherapy and appropriate
            discussion regarding the risks and benefits of doing so.

            Patient L
            Dr. Rudinskas failed to make appropriate inquiries to identify the patient's
            treating physician(s) in order to communicate the existence of a fistula, which
            could result in renewed sepsis or other issues.

            On January 25, 2010, Dr. Rudinskas entered into an interim undertaking, to
            remain in effect until the allegations in this hearing had been finally
            disposed of by the Discipline Committee. Among other things, Dr. Rudinskas
            agreed to complete routine rounds of all patients before 10:00 pm each evening
            and engage a supervisor acceptable to the College to review all aspects of both
            her hospital and office practice and to meet with her to discuss any issues or
            concerns. Pursuant to Dr. Rudinskas' interim undertaking, she engaged Dr. X as
            her Clinical Supervisor. She also completed Medical Record-Keeping for
            Physicians in October 2010, pursuant to the interim undertaking.

            The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

            - Dr. Rudinskas appear before the panel to be reprimanded;

            - The Registrar suspend Dr. Rudinskas's Certificate of Registration for a
            period of three (3) months, to commence on January 15, 2014 and ending at 11:59
            p.m. on April 14, 2014.

            - The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr.
            Rudinskas' Certificate of Registration:

            a.    Dr. Rudinskas shall, within six months of the date of this Order, attend,
            and successfully complete, an education program satisfactory to the College in
            Communications, which will involve multiple one-on-one sessions with a
            College-approved instructor (the "Instructor"), incorporating counseling,
            guided reflection, tailored feedback, and/or other modalities to be determined
            by the Instructor, with a report or reports to be provided to the College
            regarding Dr. Rudinskas's progress and compliance.  This term, condition and
            limitation shall be removed from Dr. Rudinskas' Certificate of Registration
            upon completion of this requirement;

            b.     Dr. Rudinskas shall attend and successfully complete the first available
            educational program satisfactory to the College in Ethics, with a report or
            reports to be provided to the College regarding Dr. Rudinskas' progress and
            compliance.  This term, condition and limitation shall be removed from Dr.
            Rudinskas' Certificate of Registration upon completion of this requirement;

            c.    Dr. Rudinskas shall undergo an assessment of her hospital and office
            practice within one year of this Order (the "Assessment"), which shall be
            conducted by a College-appointed assessor (the "Assessor"). Dr. Rudinskas shall
            cooperate fully with the Assessment, including but not limited to: providing
            access to her patient records, consenting to disclosure by the College or any
            hospital at which she practices to the Assessor of any information the Assessor
            deems relevant, permitting the Assessor to directly observe her provision of
            patient care, participating in interviews by the Assessor and facilitating
            interviews by the Assessor of other persons whose information the Assessor
            considers relevant. The results of the Assessment shall be reported to the
            Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College (the "ICRC") and Dr.
            Rudinskas shall abide by the recommendations of the Assessor.

            d.    Dr. Rudinskas shall comply with all policies at any hospital where she
            practices regarding the frequency and timing of patient rounds and shall, in
            any event and without limiting the foregoing requirement, complete routine
            rounds of all patients before 10:00 p.m. each evening. This term, condition and
            limitation shall remain on Dr. Rudinskas' Certificate of Registration for an
            indefinite period of time;

            e.    Dr. Rudinskas shall, within 30 days, ensure that the Chief of Staff,
            Chief of Medicine, Director, office manager or other person who is acceptable
            to the College, at any hospital or facility, not including Dr. Rudinskas'
            office, at which Dr. Rudinskas practices (the "Reporting Director(s)"), signs
            an undertaking in the form attached as Appendix "A" to this Order (the
            "Undertaking"), and that the Reporting Director(s) provide quarterly reports
            notifying the College of any concerns that have arisen with regard to Dr.
            Rudinskas's conduct, patient care, communications or collegiality. Dr.
            Rudinskas shall cooperate in all respects with the Reporting Director(s) and
            shall consent to the disclosure of any information the Reporting Director(s)
            require for the purposes of complying with the Undertaking attached hereto; 

            f.    If a Reporting Director who has given an Undertaking is unwilling or
            unable to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Rudinskas shall, within 30 days,
            obtain an Undertaking in the same form from a person who is acceptable to the
            College;

            g.    If Dr. Rudinskas is unable to obtain a Reporting Director at a hospital
            or facility at which she practices as set out in (e) or (f) above, she shall
            cease to practice at that location immediately until such time as she has
            obtained a Reporting Director at that location;

            h.    Upon completion of the Assessment and consideration of same by the ICRC,
            provided the reports of the Reporting Director(s) and the report of the
            Assessment are deemed satisfactory by the ICRC, then the quarterly reports of
            the Reporting Director(s) may be reduced to one further report to the ICRC, to
            be delivered after one further year's time. If that further report is deemed
            satisfactory by the ICRC, no further reports shall be required from the
            Reporting Director(s); and

            i.    Dr. Rudinskas shall consent to the monitoring of her OHIP billings and
            cooperate with inspections of her practice and patient charts by a College
            representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing her compliance
            with the terms of this Order.


            -  Dr. Rudinskas pay to the College costs in the amount of $55,000 to be
            payable by no later than May 1, 2014.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Dec 2013
Summary:

On December 9, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Leona Constance Rudinskas 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she failed to maintain the standard of 
practice of the profession. Dr. Rudinskas admitted the allegation. She practises oncology, 
haematology and internal medicine in Toronto, Ontario.   
 
Patient A 
Dr. Rudinskas failed to: perform appropriate assessments; round at an appropriate hour; review 
patient's condition as documented in her chart and in test results in a timely manner, and to 
respond in a timely manner to information about her condition; appropriately assess her 
following a haemoglobin drop; order a CT scan on a 'stat' basis; review results of abdominal 
x-rays demonstrating the existence of a bowel obstruction in a timely manner; diagnose a bowel 
obstruction in a timely manner; and communicate in a timely manner with the patient's family. 
 
Patient B 
Patient B, an infant, died of known cardiac congenital abnormalities. In her role as Coroner, Dr. 
Rudinskas attended at the hospital and communicated in an insensitive and unprofessional 
manner with the patient's parents immediately after his death in the course of communicating to 
them about the policy of the Coroner's office regarding co-sleeping. 
 
Patient C 
Dr. Rudinskas failed to: conduct her first patient encounter with Patient C at an appropriate hour; 
conduct a physical examination during her time as his most responsible physician; communicate 
in a timely and professional manner with the patient and his family, including by failing to 
adequately discuss her plan of care with him; terminate the physician-patient relationship in 
accordance with College policy; and accurately document her reason for termination. In 
terminating the relationship, Dr. Rudinskas communicated with the patient's daughter in an 
insensitive and unprofessional manner. 
 
Patient D 
Dr. Rudinskas communicated additional information confirming the patient's cancer diagnosis to 
her in an inappropriate manner and at an inappropriate hour and failed to document an 
appropriate discussion of the risks and benefits of treatment. 
 
Patient E 
Dr. Rudinskas failed to document in patient's chart the rationale for a treatment decision, an 
appropriate discussion regarding the same, and an appropriate discussion regarding the use of a 
taxane regime. She also failed to make a physician-to-physician transfer when the patient moved 
to another city to complete her treatment. 
 
Patient F and G 
Dr. Rudinskas failed to document in the patients' charts an appropriate discussion of the risks and 
benefits of treatment. 
 
Patient H 
Dr. Rudinskas failed to consider additional steps to investigate a differential diagnosis for this 
patient's anemia. 
 
Patient I and Patient M 

Dr. Rudinskas failed to document in the patients' charts appropriate physical examination and 
appropriate discussion regarding the risks of benefits of treatment. 
 
Patient J 
Dr. Rudinskas failed to document appropriate assessment of Patient J when she presented 
complaining of gait instability and failed to document the treatment plan in the patient's chart. 
 
Patient K 
Dr. Rudinskas failed to document in the patient's chart the reasons for her decision to administer 
a seventh round of chemotherapy and appropriate discussion regarding the risks and benefits of 
doing so. 
 
Patient L 
Dr. Rudinskas failed to make appropriate inquiries to identify the patient's treating physician(s) in 
order to communicate the existence of a fistula, which could result in renewed sepsis or other 
issues. 
 
On January 25, 2010, Dr. Rudinskas entered into an interim undertaking, to remain in effect until 
the allegations in this hearing had been finally disposed of by the Discipline Committee. Among 
other things, Dr. Rudinskas agreed to complete routine rounds of all patients before 10:00 pm 
each evening and engage a supervisor acceptable to the College to review all aspects of both her 
hospital and office practice and to meet with her to discuss any issues or concerns. Pursuant to 
Dr. Rudinskas' interim undertaking, she engaged Dr. X as her Clinical Supervisor. She also 
completed Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians in October 2010, pursuant to the interim 
undertaking. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      Dr. Rudinskas appear before the panel to be reprimanded;  
      the Registrar suspend Dr. Rudinskas's Certificate of Registration for a period of three (3) 
      months, to commence on January 15, 2014 and ending at 11:59 p.m. on April 14, 2014. 
      the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Rudinskas' 
      Certificate of Registration:  
 
      a.    Dr. Rudinskas shall, within six months of the date of this Order, attend, and 
            successfully complete, an education program satisfactory to the College in 
            Communications, which will involve multiple one-on-one sessions with a 
            College-approved instructor (the "Instructor"), incorporating counseling, guided 
            reflection, tailored feedback, and/or other modalities to be determined by the 
            Instructor, with a report or reports to be provided to the College regarding Dr. 
            Rudinskas's progress and compliance.  This term, condition and limitation shall 
      be removed from Dr. Rudinskas' Certificate of Registration upon completion of 
      this requirement; 
b.     Dr. Rudinskas shall attend and successfully complete the first available 
      educational program satisfactory to the College in Ethics, with a report or reports 
      to be provided to the College regarding Dr. Rudinskas' progress and compliance.  
      This term, condition and limitation shall be removed from Dr. Rudinskas' 
      Certificate of Registration upon completion of this requirement;     
              
c.    Dr. Rudinskas shall undergo an assessment of her hospital and office practice 
      within one year of this Order (the "Assessment"), which shall be conducted by a 
      College-appointed assessor (the "Assessor"). Dr. Rudinskas shall cooperate fully 
      with the Assessment, including but not limited to: providing access to her patient 
      records, consenting to disclosure by the College or any hospital at which she 
      practices to the Assessor of any information the Assessor deems relevant, 
      permitting the Assessor to directly observe her provision of patient care, 
      participating in interviews by the Assessor and facilitating interviews by the 
      Assessor of other persons whose information the Assessor considers relevant. The 
      results of the Assessment shall be reported to the Inquiries, Complaints and 
      Reports Committee of the College (the "ICRC") and Dr. Rudinskas shall abide by 
      the recommendations of the Assessor.  
d.    Dr. Rudinskas shall comply with all policies at any hospital where she practices 
      regarding the frequency and timing of patient rounds and shall, in any event and 
      without limiting the foregoing requirement, complete routine rounds of all 
      patients before 10:00 p.m. each evening. This term, condition and limitation shall 
      remain on Dr. Rudinskas' Certificate of Registration for an indefinite period of 
      time; 
e.    Dr. Rudinskas shall, within 30 days, ensure that the Chief of Staff, Chief of 
      Medicine, Director, office manager or other person who is acceptable to the 
      College, at any hospital or facility, not including Dr. Rudinskas' office, at which 
      Dr. Rudinskas practices (the "Reporting Director(s)"), signs an undertaking in the 
      form attached as Appendix "A" to this Order (the "Undertaking"), and that the 
      Reporting Director(s) provide quarterly reports notifying the College of any 
      concerns that have arisen with regard to Dr. Rudinskas's conduct, patient care, 
      communications or collegiality. Dr. Rudinskas shall cooperate in all respects with 
      the Reporting Director(s) and shall consent to the disclosure of any information 
      the Reporting Director(s) require for the purposes of complying with the 
      Undertaking attached hereto;   
f.    If a Reporting Director who has given an Undertaking is unwilling or unable to 
      continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Rudinskas shall, within 30 days, obtain an 
      Undertaking in the same form from a person who is acceptable to the College; 
g.    If Dr. Rudinskas is unable to obtain a Reporting Director at a hospital or facility at 
      which she practices as set out in (e) or (f) above, she shall cease to practice at that 
      location immediately until such time as she has obtained a Reporting Director at 
      that location;  
h.    Upon completion of the Assessment and consideration of same by the ICRC, 
      provided the reports of the Reporting Director(s) and the report of the Assessment 
      are deemed satisfactory by the ICRC, then the quarterly reports of the Reporting 
      Director(s) may be reduced to one further report to the ICRC, to be delivered after 
      one further year's time. If that further report is deemed satisfactory by the ICRC, 
      no further reports shall be required from the Reporting Director(s); and 
i.    Dr. Rudinskas shall consent to the monitoring of her OHIP billings and cooperate 
      with inspections of her practice and patient charts by a College representative(s) 
      for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing her compliance with the terms of this 
      Order. 
Dr. Rudinskas pay to the College costs in the amount of $55,000 to be payable by no later 
than May 1, 2014.  
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 2-3,Dec 12-16,2011,Apr 2-3,Aug 13-15,Oct 16-19,Dec 17-19,2012,Apr 8-12,May 27-29,Jun 11-13,Sep 25-26,Dec 9, 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 10, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a “caution-in-person” is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)