Rumble, Edward John (CPSO#: 25769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.J. Rumble Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rumble ( CPSO# 25769 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD JOHN RUMBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUMBLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1973