Ruparelia, Meera (CPSO#: 87405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
309 Park St.
Suite 203
Brockville ON  K6V 6E5
Phone: (613) 345-0918
Fax: (613) 345-0865
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meera Ruparelia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ruparelia ( CPSO# 87405 )

Business Address:
203 - 309 Park Street
Brockville ON  K6V 6E5
Phone Number: (613) 345-0918

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEERA RUPARELIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUPARELIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Jul 2007 to 10 Aug 2007
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2008