Rusen, Ira David (CPSO#: 65529)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
112 Avon Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5N7
Phone: (519) 271-4078
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rusen Steele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Steele ( CPSO# 67811 )
Dr. I. Rusen ( CPSO# 65529 )

Business Address:
PO Box 790
7 Frances Street
Mitchell ON  N0K 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 348-8402

Business Address:
112 Avon Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5N7
Phone Number: (519) 273-1576

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRA DAVID RUSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993