Russell, Deanna Jane (CPSO#: 80058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Names: Daneshmend, Deanna Jane (used until: 27 Jan 2013 )     Russell, Deanna Jane (used until: 14 Nov 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone: (613) 650-5472
Fax: (613) 549-0490
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

108 County Rd 95
Wolfe Island ON  K0H 2Y0
Canada
Phone: 613-650-5472
Fax: 613-549-0490
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

108 County Rd 95
Wolfe Island ON  K0H 2Y0
Canada
Phone: 613-650-5472
Fax: 613-549-0490
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deanna Jane Russell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Russell ( CPSO# 80058 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 650-5472

Business Address:
Suite 200
2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone Number: (613) 546-6652

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 May 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEANNA JANE RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2003