Russell, Steven Bruce (CPSO#: 60638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Ext. 5417
Fax: (844) 874-3529
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Corporation
Port Perry
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Canada
Phone: (905) 985-7321
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adams Gilmour Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 25659 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. K. Smith ( CPSO# 66319 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Russell and Russell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN BRUCE RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1991