Rust, Andrew Christopher (CPSO#: 100814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: 905-378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gabrielli Rust Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rust ( CPSO# 100814)
Dr. L. Gabrielli ( CPSO# 100678)

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 744-7431

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW CHRISTOPHER RUST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015