Ruth, Jonathan David (CPSO#: 51543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Grace Hospital Centre
47 austin terrace
Toronto ON  M4Y 2G5
Phone: (416) 925-2251
Fax: (416) 925-3211
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

123 edward street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-0997
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Ruth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2009


Corporation Name: John Ruth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ruth ( CPSO# 51543 )

Business Address:
Unit 100
47 Austin Terrace
Toronto ON  M5R 1Y8
Phone Number: (416) 925-2251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DAVID RUTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUTH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1984