Tatzel, Stephanie Marie (CPSO#: 95837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NIagara Urology Associates Inc
3350 Merrittvillle Highway
Unit #2
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone: (905) 641-5556 Ext. 3
Fax: 905-641-7515
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy R. Tatzel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tatzel ( CPSO# 52060 )
Dr. S. Tatzel ( CPSO# 95837 )

Business Address:
Thorold Medical Clinic
60 Albert Street West
Thorold ON  L2V 2G7
Phone Number: (905) 227-5255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE MARIE TATZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TATZEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017