Saad, Genevieve (CPSO#: 76252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: Bastien, Genevieve (used until: 09 Jul 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 121
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 252-4994
Fax: (519) 252-4995
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Saad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Saad ( CPSO# 76252 )
Dr. W. Saad ( CPSO# 76259 )

Business Address:
202 - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 252-9861

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE SAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003