Saad, Reda Shibl Mahmoud (CPSO#: 86111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital, Metro
Campus, Dept of Laboratory Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue, Windsor ON N8W1L1
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. x52076
Fax: (519) 258-5124
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B7
Canada
Phone: 519-437-6400 Ext. 6011
Fax: 519-437-6140
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reda Saad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Saad ( CPSO# 86111 )

Business Address:
137 Brian Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 3Y8
Phone Number: (416) 827-8485

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 827-8485

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Health System
80 Grand Avenue West Street
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (416) 827-8485

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 26 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REDA SHIBL MAHMOUD SAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2008