Saadaldeen, Salwa Adnan (CPSO#: 78074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Masonville Medical Clinic
Unit 4
1673 Richmond Street North
London ON  N6G 2N3
Phone: (519) 951-7178
Fax: (519) 951-7953
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saadaldeen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saadaldeen ( CPSO# 78074 )

Business Address:
Masonville Medical Clinic
Unit 4
1673 Richmond Street North
London ON  N6G 2N3
Phone Number: (519) 951-7178

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALWA ADNAN SAADALDEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAADALDEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004