Sabbagh, Charles Nasri John (CPSO#: 75175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone: (613) 736-1137
Fax: (613) 739-1337
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Sabbagh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sabbagh ( CPSO# 75175 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone Number: (613) 736-1137

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES NASRI JOHN SABBAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABBAGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004