Sabieh, Sadia (CPSO#: 94842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Edward Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sabieh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sabieh ( CPSO# 94842 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
700 Coronation Street
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Feb 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Sadia Sabeih may practise medicine independently in internal medicine as a
            Hospitalist, only.