Sachedina, Ayaaz Kazmir (CPSO#: 98165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Suite C6 004
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

256 Pall Mall Street
Suite 302
London ON  N6A 5P6
Canada
Phone: 519-645-0146
Fax: 519-645-1584
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AYAAZ KAZMIR SACHEDINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHEDINA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016