Sachs, Adam Joshua (CPSO#: 79509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
C2220-1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-761-5383
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam J. Sachs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sachs ( CPSO# 79509 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite C2220
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-5383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 21 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM JOSHUA SACHS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012