Sadaf, Arifa (CPSO#: 84950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Medical Imaging Department
585 University Avenue, 1 PMB 285
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: 416-340-4800
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIFA SADAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADAF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Jun 2006 to 23 Jul 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 29 Sep 2007
Research Fellows - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Sep 2007 to 02 Nov 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2012