Sadik, Zaki Kamel (CPSO#: 70169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Asyut University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper Thornhill Medical Centre
Suite 110
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (289) 553-3300
Fax: (289) 553-2600
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1261 kennedy
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zaki Sadik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Sadik ( CPSO# 70169 )

Business Address:
Upper Thornhill Medical Centre
110 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-3300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Mar 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAKI KAMEL SADIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 31 May 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1999