Sadry, Dhun Shavakshaw (CPSO#: 65021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi, Urdu

Education:University of Bombay, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4 The Market Place
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Phone: (416) 690-3412
Fax: (416) 691-2543
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dhun Sadry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sadry ( CPSO# 65021 )

Business Address:
Unit 4
4 The Market Place
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Phone Number: (416) 690-3412

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DHUN SHAVAKSHAW SADRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993