Saeedi-Tabar, Soheil (CPSO#: 65388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 418
1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9
Phone: (905) 624-6922
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saeedi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saeedi-Tabar ( CPSO# 65388 )

Business Address:
418 - 1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga ON  L5E 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 624-6922

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOHEIL SAEEDI-TABAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEEDI-TABAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993