Safieh, Patrick (CPSO#: 62499)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A1
3492 Weston Road
Weston ON  M9M 2W1
Phone: (416) 744-8510
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Safieh Kosar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Safieh ( CPSO# 62499 )
Dr. K. Kosar ( CPSO# 62530 )

Business Address:
3492 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9M 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 744-8510

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK SAFIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFIEH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991