Sahsi, Rupinder Singh (CPSO#: 76338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kitchener-Waterloo Emergency Depts.
c/o St. Mary's General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6410
Fax: (226) 444-9576
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
835 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4242
Fax: (226) 444-9576
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. S. Sahsi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sahsi ( CPSO# 76338 )

Business Address:
Centre for Paramedic Education and Research
Suite 201
430 McNeilly Road
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 5E3
Phone Number: (905) 643-1103

Business Address:
St Mary's General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6410

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUPINDER SINGH SAHSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003