Saini, Lalit Kumar (CPSO#: 81297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6001
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Saini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Saini ( CPSO# 81297 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6001

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LALIT KUMAR SAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2008