Sakamoto, Terence Keith (CPSO#: 59304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
R R 5
123 Millennium Parkway
Belleville ON  K8N 4Z5
Phone: (613) 961-7440
Fax: (613) 961-1798
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T Sakamoto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sakamoto ( CPSO# 59304 )

Business Address:
123 Millennium Parkway
R R #5
Belleville ON  K8N 4Z5
Phone Number: (613) 961-7440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 28 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERENCE KEITH SAKAMOTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAKAMOTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1989