Sakuls, Peter (CPSO#: 59688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: Cakuls, Peter-Alexander (used until: 29 Jun 1989 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1466 Bathurst St.
Suite 205
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone: (416) 483-8111
Fax: (416) 483-8182
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Sakuls Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sakuls ( CPSO# 59688 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 483-8111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER SAKULS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAKULS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989