Salathiel, Ian Paul (CPSO#: 73717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43205
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Salathiel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Li ( CPSO# 73788 )
Dr. I. Salathiel ( CPSO# 73717 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 26 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN PAUL SALATHIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALATHIEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2000