Saleh, Maha Safey El-Din (CPSO#: 95148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maha Saleh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saleh ( CPSO# 95148 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHA SAFEY EL-DIN SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017