Sales, Valerie (CPSO#: 67490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street PO 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: (905) 472-7621
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Pediatric Health Centre
207-5293 Highway 7
General Paediatrics
Peadiatric Infectious Diseases
Markham ON  L3P 7M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 471-7787
Fax: 905 472 5148
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

200 Elizabeth Street
Immunodeficiency clinic
13th floor, West Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416 340 5077
Fax: 416 340 4890
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Western Hospital
TB clinic 8th floor East Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5853
Fax: (416) 603-5987
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sales Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sales ( CPSO# 67490 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
8th Floor East Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5853

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
13th Floor, West Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
207 - 5293 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7M7
Phone Number: (905) 471-7787

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE SALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1993