Salja Halili, Elvira (CPSO#: 84881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, Bosnian, Croatian, English

Education:UNIVERSITY OF PRISTINA, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
34 Ottawa Street
PO Box 772
Morrisburg ON  K0C 1X0
Phone: (613) 543-2963
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Winchester District Memorial Hosp
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2422
Fax: (613) 774-0453
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Salja Halili Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Salja Halili ( CPSO# 84881 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
34 Ottawa Street
Morrisburg ON  K0C 1X0
Phone Number: (613) 543-2963

Business Address:
5 College Street
Iroquois ON  K0E 1K0
Phone Number: (613) 652-4884

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELVIRA SALJA HALILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALJA HALILI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009