Salmon, Ernest Arnold Trevorlyn (CPSO#: 20790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1A1
Phone: (905) 509-5867
Fax: (905) 509-7929
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Digestive Health Clinic
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-1700
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ernest Salmon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Salmon ( CPSO# 20790 )

Business Address:
301 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 509-5862

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERNEST ARNOLD TREVORLYN SALMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALMON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Jan 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1974