Samant, Meghana Narayan (CPSO#: 91253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MN Samant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Samant ( CPSO# 91253 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGHANA NARAYAN SAMANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMANT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013