Samant, Rajiv Singh (CPSO#: 61329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70212
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajiv Samant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Samant ( CPSO# 61329 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJIV SINGH SAMANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMANT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1989