Sampson, Gweneth Lorraine (CPSO#: 58039)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville ON  L4A 1H2
Phone: (905) 640-3100
Fax: (905) 640-5346
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gweneth Sampson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sampson ( CPSO# 58039 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville ON  L4A 1H2
Phone Number: (905) 640-3100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GWENETH LORRAINE SAMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMPSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1988