Samson, Lindy Michelle (CPSO#: 62549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2243
Fax: (613) 738-4866
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Samson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Samson ( CPSO# 62549 )
Dr. W. Creery ( CPSO# 61008 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDY MICHELLE SAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1992
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1993