Samsoondar, Wayne Robindranath (CPSO#: 51563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10168 Yonge Street
Suite 104
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T6
Phone: (905) 737-4224
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wayne Samsoondar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Samsoondar ( CPSO# 51563 )

Business Address:
104 - 10168 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T6
Phone Number: (905) 737-4224

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE ROBINDRANATH SAMSOONDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMSOONDAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1986